Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Health Benefit Exchange

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0195
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Health Benefits - Required Participation in the Individual Exchange by Carriers
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0196 /CH0105 (SB0124/CH0104)
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange – Assessment Applicability and Report on State–Based Individual Market Health Insurance Subsidies
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0400
Title
Tax - General - Vaping Product Tax
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0930 (SB0977)
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Funding for Small Business Insurance Subsidies and Outreach
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0959 /CH0620 (SB0872/CH0621)
Title
Health Insurance - Consumer Protections
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1329
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Establishment of Small Business Health Insurance Subsidies Program
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1663 /CH0014 (SB1080/CH0013)
Title
State Government – State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency – Authority of Governor and Unemployment Insurance Benefits (COVID–19 Public Health Emergency Protection Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0124 /CH0104 (HB0196/CH0105)
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange – Assessment Applicability and State–Based Individual Market Health Insurance Subsidies
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0228
Title
Public Health - Commission on Universal Health Care
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0872 /CH0621 (HB0959/CH0620)
Title
Health Insurance - Consumer Protections
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0977 (HB0930)
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Funding for Small Business Insurance Subsidies and Outreach
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1080 /CH0013 (HB1663/CH0014)
Title
State Government – State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency – Authority of Governor and Unemployment Insurance Benefits (COVID–19 Public Health Emergency Protection Act of 2020)
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0195 State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Health Benefits - Required Participation in the Individual Exchange by Carriers Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB0196 /CH0105 (SB0124/CH0104) Maryland Health Benefit Exchange – Assessment Applicability and Report on State–Based Individual Market Health Insurance Subsidies Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 105
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0400 Tax - General - Vaping Product Tax Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
Economic Matters
HB0930 (SB0977) Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Funding for Small Business Insurance Subsidies and Outreach Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0959 /CH0620 (SB0872/CH0621) Health Insurance - Consumer Protections Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 620
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1329 Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Establishment of Small Business Health Insurance Subsidies Program Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1663 /CH0014 (SB1080/CH0013) State Government – State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency – Authority of Governor and Unemployment Insurance Benefits (COVID–19 Public Health Emergency Protection Act of 2020) Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 14
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0124 /CH0104 (HB0196/CH0105) Maryland Health Benefit Exchange – Assessment Applicability and State–Based Individual Market Health Insurance Subsidies Senator Feldman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 104
Finance
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0228 Public Health - Commission on Universal Health Care Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0872 /CH0621 (HB0959/CH0620) Health Insurance - Consumer Protections Senator Feldman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 621
Finance
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0977 (HB0930) Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Funding for Small Business Insurance Subsidies and Outreach Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB1080 /CH0013 (HB1663/CH0014) State Government – State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency – Authority of Governor and Unemployment Insurance Benefits (COVID–19 Public Health Emergency Protection Act of 2020) President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 13
Finance
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:22 PM