Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Harford County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0054 (SB0129)
Title
Education – Harford County – Liability of School Bus Contractors
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0085 (SB0651)
Title
Baltimore County - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Detention and Correctional Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Bhandari
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0144 (SB0248)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Beer and Wine License
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0283 (SB0382)
Title
Harford County - Board of Education - Terms of Appointed Members
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0287
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Resort Complex License
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0312 (SB0386)
Title
Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Assisted Living Program License
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0615
Title
Natural Resources - Sunday Deer Hunting and Archery Hunting Safety Zones - Prince George's County PG 402-21
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0984
Title
Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – License Limits
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1094 (SB0650)
Title
Workgroup to Evaluate the Establishment of a Regional Waste Disposal Facility
Sponsor
Delegate Ruth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1100 (SB0390)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Gift Basket Permit
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0071
Title
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Body-Worn Cameras, Employee Programs, and Use of Force
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0129 (HB0054)
Title
Education – Harford County – Liability of School Bus Contractors
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0248 (HB0144)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Beer and Wine License
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0382 (HB0283)
Title
Harford County - Board of Education - Terms of Appointed Members
Sponsor
Harford County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0386 (HB0312)
Title
Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Assisted Living Program License
Sponsor
Harford County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0390 (HB1100)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Gift Basket Permit
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0650 (HB1094)
Title
Workgroup to Evaluate the Establishment of a Regional Waste Disposal Facility
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0651 (HB0085)
Title
Baltimore County - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Detention and Correctional Officers
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0054 (SB0129) Education – Harford County – Liability of School Bus Contractors Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0085 (SB0651) Baltimore County - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Detention and Correctional Officers Delegate Bhandari 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0144 (SB0248) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Beer and Wine License Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0283 (SB0382) Harford County - Board of Education - Terms of Appointed Members Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0287 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Resort Complex License Delegate Johnson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0312 (SB0386) Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Assisted Living Program License Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0615 Natural Resources - Sunday Deer Hunting and Archery Hunting Safety Zones - Prince George's County PG 402-21 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0984 Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – License Limits Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1094 (SB0650) Workgroup to Evaluate the Establishment of a Regional Waste Disposal Facility Delegate Ruth 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1100 (SB0390) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Gift Basket Permit Harford County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0071 Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Body-Worn Cameras, Employee Programs, and Use of Force Senator Sydnor 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Judicial Proceedings
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
SB0129 (HB0054) Education – Harford County – Liability of School Bus Contractors Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/20 at 3:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2021 - 3:00 PM
SB0248 (HB0144) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Beer and Wine License Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
SB0382 (HB0283) Harford County - Board of Education - Terms of Appointed Members Harford County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0386 (HB0312) Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Assisted Living Program License Harford County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0390 (HB1100) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Gift Basket Permit Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0650 (HB1094) Workgroup to Evaluate the Establishment of a Regional Waste Disposal Facility Senator Klausmeier 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0651 (HB0085) Baltimore County - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Detention and Correctional Officers Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/9/2021 7:15 PM
Click to return on the top page