Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Harassment -see also- Threats

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0005 /CH0021 (SB0161/CH0022)
Title
Crimes - Hate Crimes - Use of an Item or a Symbol to Threaten or Intimidate
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0325 /CH0168 (SB0961/CH0169)
Title
Sexual Harassment Prevention Training - Designated Coordinator - University System of Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0744
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Tenant Rights and Protections (Tenant Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0964
Title
Employment Discrimination – Definitions of “Employee” and “Harassment” (Workplace Civility Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1103 (SB0924)
Title
Maryland Child Abduction Prevention Act
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1115 (SB0436)
Title
Courts - Improperly Summoning a Police Officer - Civil Liability
Sponsor
Delegate Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1558 (SB0818)
Title
Residential Treatment Centers and Facilities - Sexual Abuse and Harassment - Reporting and Prevention
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0161 /CH0022 (HB0005/CH0021)
Title
Crimes - Hate Crimes - Use of an Item or a Symbol to Threaten or Intimidate
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0335
Title
Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Harassment and Destruction of Property
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0407
Title
Office of the Attorney General - Senior and Vulnerable Adult Asset Recovery Unit
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0436 (HB1115)
Title
Courts - Improperly Summoning a Police Officer - Civil Liability
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0818 (HB1558)
Title
Residential Treatment Centers and Facilities – Sexual Abuse and Harassment – Reporting and Prevention
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0924 (HB1103)
Title
Maryland Child Abduction Prevention Act
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0961 /CH0169 (HB0325/CH0168)
Title
Sexual Harassment Prevention Training - Designated Coordinator - University System of Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0972
Title
Baltimore City - Community Oversight and Accountability Commission of Baltimore City
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1071
Title
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Study
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0005 /CH0021 (SB0161/CH0022) Crimes - Hate Crimes - Use of an Item or a Symbol to Threaten or Intimidate Delegate Chang 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 21
Judiciary
1/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0325 /CH0168 (SB0961/CH0169) Sexual Harassment Prevention Training - Designated Coordinator - University System of Maryland Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 168
Appropriations
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0744 Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Tenant Rights and Protections (Tenant Protection Act) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0964 Employment Discrimination – Definitions of “Employee” and “Harassment” (Workplace Civility Act) Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1103 (SB0924) Maryland Child Abduction Prevention Act Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1115 (SB0436) Courts - Improperly Summoning a Police Officer - Civil Liability Delegate Charles 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1558 (SB0818) Residential Treatment Centers and Facilities - Sexual Abuse and Harassment - Reporting and Prevention Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0161 /CH0022 (HB0005/CH0021) Crimes - Hate Crimes - Use of an Item or a Symbol to Threaten or Intimidate Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 22
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0335 Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Harassment and Destruction of Property Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0407 Office of the Attorney General - Senior and Vulnerable Adult Asset Recovery Unit Senator Kramer 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2020 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Judiciary
Appropriations
SB0436 (HB1115) Courts - Improperly Summoning a Police Officer - Civil Liability Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0818 (HB1558) Residential Treatment Centers and Facilities – Sexual Abuse and Harassment – Reporting and Prevention Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0924 (HB1103) Maryland Child Abduction Prevention Act Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0961 /CH0169 (HB0325/CH0168) Sexual Harassment Prevention Training - Designated Coordinator - University System of Maryland Senator Hettleman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 169
Finance
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0972 Baltimore City - Community Oversight and Accountability Commission of Baltimore City Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB1071 Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Study Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/6/2020 1:37 PM