Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Gangs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1083 /CH0422 (SB0745)
Title
Criminal Organizations – Penalties and Procedure
Sponsor
Delegate Pippy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1411
Title
Correctional Services – Transfers to Federal Authorities – Undocumented Immigrants (Protecting Marylanders from Violent Crime Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1546
Title
Education - Reportable Offenses - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0197
Title
Correctional Facilities - Individuals Subject to Immigration Detainer - Homeland Security Notification
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0745 (HB1083/CH0422)
Title
Criminal Organizations – Penalties and Procedure
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1083 /CH0422 (SB0745) Criminal Organizations – Penalties and Procedure Delegate Pippy 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 422
Judiciary
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1411 Correctional Services – Transfers to Federal Authorities – Undocumented Immigrants (Protecting Marylanders from Violent Crime Act of 2020) Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1546 Education - Reportable Offenses - Alterations Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0197 Correctional Facilities - Individuals Subject to Immigration Detainer - Homeland Security Notification Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0745 (HB1083/CH0422) Criminal Organizations – Penalties and Procedure Senator Hough 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2020 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/8/2020 1:58 PM