Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Foster Care

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0348 (SB0267)
Title
AP Opportunities Act of 2020
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0369 (SB0586)
Title
Foster Parents, Preadoptive Parents, and Caregivers - Right to Intervene
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0754 (SB0564/CH0565)
Title
Education - High School Graduation Requirements - Students in Foster Care or Homeless Youth
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0839 (SB0539)
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0986 (SB0662)
Title
State Child Welfare System - Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1004 (SB0769)
Title
Department of Juvenile Services - Juvenile Strategic Reentry Program
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1234
Title
County Boards of Education - Student Transportation - Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1300 (SB1000)
Title
Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0267 (HB0348)
Title
AP Opportunities Act of 2020
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0539 (HB0839)
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0564 /CH0565 (HB0754)
Title
Education - High School Graduation Requirements - Students in Foster Care or Homeless Youth
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0585
Title
Family Law - Children in Out-of-Home Placements - Mandatory Concurrent Planning
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0586 (HB0369)
Title
Foster Parents, Preadoptive Parents, and Caregivers – Request to Intervene
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0662 (HB0986)
Title
State Child Welfare System - Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0769 (HB1004)
Title
Department of Juvenile Services - Juvenile Strategic Reentry Program
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1000 (HB1300)
Title
Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0348 (SB0267) AP Opportunities Act of 2020 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB0369 (SB0586) Foster Parents, Preadoptive Parents, and Caregivers - Right to Intervene Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0754 (SB0564/CH0565) Education - High School Graduation Requirements - Students in Foster Care or Homeless Youth Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0839 (SB0539) Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/24/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0986 (SB0662) State Child Welfare System - Reporting Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Appropriations
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1004 (SB0769) Department of Juvenile Services - Juvenile Strategic Reentry Program Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1234 County Boards of Education - Student Transportation - Vehicles Delegate Adams 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1300 (SB1000) Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation Speaker 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Appropriations
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Ways and Means
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
SB0267 (HB0348) AP Opportunities Act of 2020 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0539 (HB0839) Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0564 /CH0565 (HB0754) Education - High School Graduation Requirements - Students in Foster Care or Homeless Youth Senator Washington 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 565
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0585 Family Law - Children in Out-of-Home Placements - Mandatory Concurrent Planning Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/11/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0586 (HB0369) Foster Parents, Preadoptive Parents, and Caregivers – Request to Intervene Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0662 (HB0986) State Child Welfare System - Reporting Senator Zucker 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0769 (HB1004) Department of Juvenile Services - Juvenile Strategic Reentry Program Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB1000 (HB1300) Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/13/2020 3:56 PM