Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Foreign Trade -see also- International Affairs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0424 (SB0447/CH0555)
Title
Public Health - Products Containing a Flame-Retardant Chemical
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1086
Title
Workgroup to Study Basic Economic Security
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1592 (SB1044)
Title
State Government - Prevention of Genocide and Crimes Against Humanity and the Commission on Genocide Prevention
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0024
Title
Small Business Fairness Act
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0311
Title
Corporate Tax Fairness Act of 2020
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0447 /CH0555 (HB0424)
Title
Public Health - Products Containing a Flame-Retardant Chemical
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0694
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment Exemption - Worldwide Headquartered Company Election
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1044 (HB1592)
Title
State Government - Prevention of Genocide and Crimes Against Humanity and the Commission on Genocide Prevention
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0424 (SB0447/CH0555) Public Health - Products Containing a Flame-Retardant Chemical Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1086 Workgroup to Study Basic Economic Security Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1592 (SB1044) State Government - Prevention of Genocide and Crimes Against Humanity and the Commission on Genocide Prevention Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0024 Small Business Fairness Act Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/09/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB0311 Corporate Tax Fairness Act of 2020 Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0447 /CH0555 (HB0424) Public Health - Products Containing a Flame-Retardant Chemical Senator Guzzone 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 555
Finance
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0694 Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment Exemption - Worldwide Headquartered Company Election Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB1044 (HB1592) State Government - Prevention of Genocide and Crimes Against Humanity and the Commission on Genocide Prevention Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:15 PM