Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Food Stamps

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0348 (SB0267)
Title
AP Opportunities Act of 2020
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0559 (SB0452)
Title
Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0698
Title
Food Supplement Employment and Training Program - Benefits and Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1463
Title
Correctional Services - Inmates - Intake and Release Requirements (Reentry Success Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1517
Title
Critical Medical Needs Program Expansion Pilot Program - Social Services
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1532
Title
Human Services – Food Supplement Program – Eligibility (Protect Against Hunger Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0049 /CH0508
Title
Department of Human Services - Food Supplement Program - Renaming
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0267 (HB0348)
Title
AP Opportunities Act of 2020
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0452 (HB0559)
Title
Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Funding
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0348 (SB0267) AP Opportunities Act of 2020 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB0559 (SB0452) Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Funding Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0698 Food Supplement Employment and Training Program - Benefits and Funding Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1463 Correctional Services - Inmates - Intake and Release Requirements (Reentry Success Act of 2020) Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1517 Critical Medical Needs Program Expansion Pilot Program - Social Services Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB1532 Human Services – Food Supplement Program – Eligibility (Protect Against Hunger Act) Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0049 /CH0508 Department of Human Services - Food Supplement Program - Renaming Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 508
Finance
1/09/2020 - 1:45 PM
Appropriations
SB0267 (HB0348) AP Opportunities Act of 2020 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0452 (HB0559) Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Funding Senator McCray 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/14/2020 11:22 AM