Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Financial Institutions -see also- Banks; Credit Unions; etc.

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0006 (SB0080)
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0041
Title
Maryland State Bank Task Force - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0471 (SB0185)
Title
Financial Institutions - Security Questions and Measures
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0664 (SB0532)
Title
Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Sales-Based Financing Transactions
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0772
Title
Courts - Judgments - Exemptions from Execution
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0829 (SB0788)
Title
Economic Development – Small Business Financing – Loan Loss Reserve (Maryland Capital Access Program)
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1014 (SB0772)
Title
Small Business COVID-19 Relief Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Education Savings Account Program - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1178
Title
Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – First–Time Homebuyer Savings Accounts
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1213
Title
Financial Institutions - Determination of Creditworthiness - Evaluation Rules and Alternative Methods
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1351
Title
Campaign Finance - Contribution Through Third-Party Payment Processor and Payment of Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0080 (HB0006)
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0185 (HB0471)
Title
Financial Institutions - Security Questions and Measures
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0219 /CH0100
Title
Financial Institutions – Commissioner of Financial Regulation – Money Transmissions
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0532 (HB0664)
Title
Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Sales-Based Financing Transactions
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0609
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Industrial Development Financing Authority - Marketing Plan
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0772 (HB1014)
Title
Small Business COVID–19 Relief Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0788 (HB0829)
Title
Economic Development – Small Business Financing – Loan Loss Reserve (Maryland Capital Access Program)
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0933
Title
Financial Regulation - Access to Banking and Financial Services - Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0006 (SB0080) Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Alterations Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Ways and Means
1/14/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0041 Maryland State Bank Task Force - Establishment Delegate Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0471 (SB0185) Financial Institutions - Security Questions and Measures Delegate Watson, C. 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0664 (SB0532) Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Sales-Based Financing Transactions Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0772 Courts - Judgments - Exemptions from Execution Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0829 (SB0788) Economic Development – Small Business Financing – Loan Loss Reserve (Maryland Capital Access Program) Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
Budget and Taxation
HB1014 (SB0772) Small Business COVID-19 Relief Act of 2021 Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1113 Primary and Secondary Education - Education Savings Account Program - Established Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/12/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1178 Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – First–Time Homebuyer Savings Accounts Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1213 Financial Institutions - Determination of Creditworthiness - Evaluation Rules and Alternative Methods Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1351 Campaign Finance - Contribution Through Third-Party Payment Processor and Payment of Expenses Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0080 (HB0006) Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Alterations Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Finance
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0185 (HB0471) Financial Institutions - Security Questions and Measures Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0219 /CH0100 Financial Institutions – Commissioner of Financial Regulation – Money Transmissions Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 100
Finance
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0532 (HB0664) Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Sales-Based Financing Transactions Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0609 Economic Development - Maryland Industrial Development Financing Authority - Marketing Plan Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0772 (HB1014) Small Business COVID–19 Relief Act of 2021 Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2021 - 12:00 PM
SB0788 (HB0829) Economic Development – Small Business Financing – Loan Loss Reserve (Maryland Capital Access Program) Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0933 Financial Regulation - Access to Banking and Financial Services - Reporting Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
3/18/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:21 PM
Click to return on the top page