Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Family Law -see also- Adoption; Annulment; Divorce; etc

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0170 (SB0581)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0839 (SB0539)
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1231 (SB0949)
Title
Family Law – Authorization for a Minor to Marry
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1242
Title
Family Law - Fundamental Parental Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1337
Title
Family Law - Grandparent Visitation
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1602
Title
Family Law - Grandparent Visitation
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0539 (HB0839)
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0581 (HB0170)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0595
Title
Family Law – Protective Order – Rescission
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0949 (HB1231)
Title
Family Law – Authorization for a Minor to Marry
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0170 (SB0581) Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0839 (SB0539) Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/24/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1231 (SB0949) Family Law – Authorization for a Minor to Marry Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1242 Family Law - Fundamental Parental Rights Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1337 Family Law - Grandparent Visitation Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1602 Family Law - Grandparent Visitation Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0539 (HB0839) Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0581 (HB0170) Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
Budget and Taxation
SB0595 Family Law – Protective Order – Rescission Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0949 (HB1231) Family Law – Authorization for a Minor to Marry Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2020 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/13/2020 3:56 PM