Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Ex-Offenders

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0032
Title
Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Inclusion, Restoration, and Rehabilitation Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0222 (SB0224)
Title
Value My Vote Act
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0242 (SB0173)
Title
Family Law - Emancipation of a Minor and Authorization to Marry
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0260 (SB0625)
Title
Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0420
Title
Employers of Ex-Offenders - Liability for Negligent Hiring or Inadequate Supervision - Immunity
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0531 (SB0333)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Sexual Offenders – Lifetime Supervision
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0560
Title
Human Relations - Discrimination in Housing - Reentry-Into-Society Status
Sponsor
Delegate Fennell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0723
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education – Incarcerated and Formerly Incarcerated Individuals – Academic and Employment Opportunities
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1146
Title
Environment - Office of Recycling - Mattresses and Box Springs
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0026
Title
State Highway Administration - State Highways and Interstate Highways - Litter Collection and Mowing
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0039
Title
Department of Planning - Collateral Consequences for Individuals With Criminal Records - Study
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0042
Title
Public Safety - Police Officers - Screening for Violent Behavior, Aggressive Behavior, and Bias
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0173 (HB0242)
Title
Family Law - Emancipation of a Minor and Authorization to Marry
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0224 (HB0222)
Title
Election Law – Correctional Facilities – Voter Registration and Voting
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0333 (HB0531)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Sexual Offenders - Lifetime Supervision
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0403
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education - Incarcerated and Formerly Incarcerated Individuals - Academic and Employment Opportunities
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0625 (HB0260)
Title
Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0708
Title
Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0894
Title
Post-Crisis Jobs Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0032 Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Inclusion, Restoration, and Rehabilitation Act of 2021) Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0222 (SB0224) Value My Vote Act Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (36-9)
Ways and Means
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judiciary
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Judicial Proceedings
HB0242 (SB0173) Family Law - Emancipation of a Minor and Authorization to Marry Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0260 (SB0625) Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (37-10)
Judiciary
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0420 Employers of Ex-Offenders - Liability for Negligent Hiring or Inadequate Supervision - Immunity Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0531 (SB0333) Criminal Procedure – Sexual Offenders – Lifetime Supervision Delegate Morgan 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0560 Human Relations - Discrimination in Housing - Reentry-Into-Society Status Delegate Fennell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0723 Public Institutions of Higher Education – Incarcerated and Formerly Incarcerated Individuals – Academic and Employment Opportunities Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m. (Appropriations)
Appropriations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judiciary
HB1146 Environment - Office of Recycling - Mattresses and Box Springs Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0026 State Highway Administration - State Highways and Interstate Highways - Litter Collection and Mowing Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0039 Department of Planning - Collateral Consequences for Individuals With Criminal Records - Study Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0042 Public Safety - Police Officers - Screening for Violent Behavior, Aggressive Behavior, and Bias Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0173 (HB0242) Family Law - Emancipation of a Minor and Authorization to Marry Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0224 (HB0222) Election Law – Correctional Facilities – Voter Registration and Voting Senator West 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judicial Proceedings
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0333 (HB0531) Criminal Procedure - Sexual Offenders - Lifetime Supervision Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0403 Public Institutions of Higher Education - Incarcerated and Formerly Incarcerated Individuals - Academic and Employment Opportunities Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0625 (HB0260) Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2021 - 10:00 AM
Judiciary
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0708 Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0894 Post-Crisis Jobs Act of 2021 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/10/2021 5:23 PM
Click to return on the top page