Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Drunk and Drugged Driving

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0762
Title
Task Force to Study Impaired Driving and New Technologies
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0808 (SB0309)
Title
Drugged Driving - Oral Fluid Tests - Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0952 (SB0870)
Title
Drunk Driving Offenses - Ignition Interlock System Program
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1139 (SB1010/CH0592)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1320
Title
Driving Under the Influence of Alcohol - Subsequent Offenders - Mandatory Ignition Interlock
Sponsor
Delegate Ciliberti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1334 (SB0497)
Title
Drugged Driving - Controlled Dangerous Substance Testing - Authorized Police Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Arikan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1381
Title
Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Death - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing (Danshaun's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1400
Title
Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1529 (SB0498)
Title
Drunk and Drugged Driving - Testing - Warrants
Sponsor
Delegate Arikan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0309 (HB0808)
Title
Drugged Driving - Oral Fluid Tests - Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0497 (HB1334)
Title
Drugged Driving - Controlled Dangerous Substance Testing - Authorized Police Officers
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0498 (HB1529)
Title
Drunk and Drugged Driving - Testing - Warrants
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0819
Title
Distracted Driving Monitoring Systems - Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0870 (HB0952)
Title
Drunk Driving Offenses - Ignition Interlock System Program
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1010 /CH0592 (HB1139)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0762 Task Force to Study Impaired Driving and New Technologies Delegate Williams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0808 (SB0309) Drugged Driving - Oral Fluid Tests - Pilot Program Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0952 (SB0870) Drunk Driving Offenses - Ignition Interlock System Program Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1139 (SB1010/CH0592) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1320 Driving Under the Influence of Alcohol - Subsequent Offenders - Mandatory Ignition Interlock Delegate Ciliberti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1334 (SB0497) Drugged Driving - Controlled Dangerous Substance Testing - Authorized Police Officers Delegate Arikan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1381 Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Death - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing (Danshaun's Law) Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1400 Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1529 (SB0498) Drunk and Drugged Driving - Testing - Warrants Delegate Arikan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0309 (HB0808) Drugged Driving - Oral Fluid Tests - Pilot Program Senator Kagan 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2020 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0497 (HB1334) Drugged Driving - Controlled Dangerous Substance Testing - Authorized Police Officers Senator Ready 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2020 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0498 (HB1529) Drunk and Drugged Driving - Testing - Warrants Senator Ready 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2020 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0819 Distracted Driving Monitoring Systems - Authorization Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0870 (HB0952) Drunk Driving Offenses - Ignition Interlock System Program Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB1010 /CH0592 (HB1139) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Senator Peters 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 592
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:31 PM