Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Dealers -see also- Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0004 (SB0208)
Title
Public Safety – Rifles and Shotguns – Sales, Rentals, and Transfers
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0029
Title
Secondhand Precious Metal Object Dealers and Pawnbrokers - Exemptions for Auctioneers
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0139 /CH0071 (SB0134/CH0072)
Title
Consumer Protection - Electronic Transactions - Sale and Lease of Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0356 (SB0273)
Title
Crimes - Firearms - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0655
Title
Commercial Law – Automobile Financing Charges – Required Dealer Disclosures
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1241
Title
Firearms - Law Enforcement - Patrol Responsibilities (Retail Firearm Business Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1257 (SB0816)
Title
Public Safety - Licensed Firearms Dealers (Firearms Dealers' Safety Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1261
Title
Weapon Crimes - Assault Long Guns and Copycat Weapons
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1284
Title
State Tax Credits, Exemptions, and Deductions - Alterations and Repeal (Tax Modernization Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1288 (SB0290)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0035
Title
Crimes – Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0043
Title
Licensing - Fingerprint Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0134 /CH0072 (HB0139/CH0071)
Title
Consumer Protection – Electronic Transactions – Sale and Lease of Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0208 (HB0004)
Title
Public Safety – Rifles and Shotguns – Sales, Rentals, and Transfers
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0273 (HB0356)
Title
Crimes - Firearms - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2020)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0290 (HB1288)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0816 (HB1257)
Title
Public Safety - Licensed Firearms Dealers (Firearms Dealers' Safety Act)
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0880
Title
Firearms - Dealer's License and Handgun Permit - Notice of Expiration
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0004 (SB0208) Public Safety – Rifles and Shotguns – Sales, Rentals, and Transfers Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Judiciary
1/15/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0029 Secondhand Precious Metal Object Dealers and Pawnbrokers - Exemptions for Auctioneers Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0139 /CH0071 (SB0134/CH0072) Consumer Protection - Electronic Transactions - Sale and Lease of Vehicles Delegate Crosby 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 71
Economic Matters
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0356 (SB0273) Crimes - Firearms - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2020) Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0655 Commercial Law – Automobile Financing Charges – Required Dealer Disclosures Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Special Order until 3/18 (Delegate Dumais) Adopted
Economic Matters
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1241 Firearms - Law Enforcement - Patrol Responsibilities (Retail Firearm Business Protection Act) Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1257 (SB0816) Public Safety - Licensed Firearms Dealers (Firearms Dealers' Safety Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1261 Weapon Crimes - Assault Long Guns and Copycat Weapons Speaker 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1284 State Tax Credits, Exemptions, and Deductions - Alterations and Repeal (Tax Modernization Act) Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1288 (SB0290) Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0035 Crimes – Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2020) Senator Hough 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0043 Licensing - Fingerprint Requirement Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0134 /CH0072 (HB0139/CH0071) Consumer Protection – Electronic Transactions – Sale and Lease of Vehicles Senator Feldman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 72
Finance
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0208 (HB0004) Public Safety – Rifles and Shotguns – Sales, Rentals, and Transfers Senator Lee 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0273 (HB0356) Crimes - Firearms - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2020) President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0290 (HB1288) Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0816 (HB1257) Public Safety - Licensed Firearms Dealers (Firearms Dealers' Safety Act) Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0880 Firearms - Dealer's License and Handgun Permit - Notice of Expiration Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2020 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/13/2020 1:50 PM