Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Deaf Persons

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0794
Title
Education - Educational Interpreters - Certification Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1003 (SB0851/CH0586)
Title
Human Services - Department of Disabilities - Accessibility Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1523
Title
Human Relations - Public Accommodations - Captioning in Movie Theaters (Open Captioning Equality Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1652
Title
Maryland Sign Language Interpreter Act
Sponsor
Delegate Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0610
Title
Community Colleges - Supplemental Services and Supports for Students With Disabilities Grant Program
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0851 /CH0586 (HB1003)
Title
Human Services – Department of Disabilities – Accessibility Programs
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0794 Education - Educational Interpreters - Certification Requirements Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/21/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1003 (SB0851/CH0586) Human Services - Department of Disabilities - Accessibility Programs Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1523 Human Relations - Public Accommodations - Captioning in Movie Theaters (Open Captioning Equality Act of 2020) Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1652 Maryland Sign Language Interpreter Act Delegate Kittleman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0610 Community Colleges - Supplemental Services and Supports for Students With Disabilities Grant Program Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0851 /CH0586 (HB1003) Human Services – Department of Disabilities – Accessibility Programs Senator Kagan 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 586
Finance
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:28 PM