Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Court of Appeals

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0035
Title
Judges – Selection and Retention
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0242 (SB0173)
Title
Family Law - Emancipation of a Minor and Authorization to Marry
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0315 (SB0136)
Title
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Interrogation Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0447
Title
Judges - Selection, Election, Tenure, and Continuance in Office
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0885 (SB0666)
Title
Courts of Appeals and Special Appeals – Renaming
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1011 (SB0410)
Title
Cigarettes, Other Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices - Local Law Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1354
Title
Courts – COVID–19 – Statutory Deadlines
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0173 (HB0242)
Title
Family Law - Emancipation of a Minor and Authorization to Marry
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0410 (HB1011)
Title
Cigarettes, Other Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices - Local Law Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0666 (HB0885)
Title
Courts of Appeals and Special Appeals - Renaming
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0035 Judges – Selection and Retention Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
HB0242 (SB0173) Family Law - Emancipation of a Minor and Authorization to Marry Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0315 (SB0136) Juvenile Law - Juvenile Interrogation Protection Act Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0447 Judges - Selection, Election, Tenure, and Continuance in Office Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
HB0885 (SB0666) Courts of Appeals and Special Appeals – Renaming Delegate Watson, R. 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1011 (SB0410) Cigarettes, Other Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices - Local Law Authorization Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1354 Courts – COVID–19 – Statutory Deadlines Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0173 (HB0242) Family Law - Emancipation of a Minor and Authorization to Marry Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0410 (HB1011) Cigarettes, Other Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices - Local Law Authorization Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0666 (HB0885) Courts of Appeals and Special Appeals - Renaming Senator Peters 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (123-12)
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/10/2021 1:06 PM
Click to return on the top page