Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

County Councils

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0622
Title
Prince George’s County – Land Use – Magnetic Levitation Transportation System Siting (Prince George’s County Stop the Maglev Act of 2021) PG 406–21
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0692 (SB0823)
Title
Cecil County - Board of Education - Member Terms and Compensation
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1226
Title
Municipal Incorporation - County Commissioners or County Council - Required Approval of Referendum Request
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0468
Title
Baltimore County Board of Education - Annual Budget - Conditions on Expenditures
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0823 (HB0692)
Title
Cecil County - Board of Education - Member Terms and Compensation
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0622 Prince George’s County – Land Use – Magnetic Levitation Transportation System Siting (Prince George’s County Stop the Maglev Act of 2021) PG 406–21 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0692 (SB0823) Cecil County - Board of Education - Member Terms and Compensation Cecil County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1226 Municipal Incorporation - County Commissioners or County Council - Required Approval of Referendum Request Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0468 Baltimore County Board of Education - Annual Budget - Conditions on Expenditures Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0823 (HB0692) Cecil County - Board of Education - Member Terms and Compensation Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 6:41 PM
Click to return on the top page