Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Correctional Officers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0085 (SB0651)
Title
Baltimore County - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Detention and Correctional Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Bhandari
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0131
Title
Correctional Services – Step–Down Programs – Cause of Action
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0456 (SB0606)
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Kent County
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0538 (SB0826)
Title
Handgun Permits – Qualifications – High–Risk Occupations
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0735 (SB0573)
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification – Correctional Officers, Law Enforcement Officers, and Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel (Hometown Heroes Act)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0737 (SB0570)
Title
Emergency Services – Exposure to Contagious Diseases and Viruses – Notification and Other Requirements
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0765
Title
Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – Novel Coronavirus (Essential Workers’ Compensation Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0791
Title
Military Service Credit - Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0951 (SB0370)
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification – Military and Public Safety Retirement Income
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1188 (SB0809)
Title
Office of the Attorney General – Correctional Ombudsman
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1199 (SB0813)
Title
Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – COVID–19
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1321
Title
Labor and Employment - Right to Work
Sponsor
Delegate Novotny
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0044
Title
Correctional Officers - Age Requirement
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0277
Title
Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officer - Definition and Limitation on Credit Amount
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0370 (HB0951)
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification – Military and Public Safety Retirement Income
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0570 (HB0737)
Title
Emergency Services – Exposure to Contagious Diseases and Viruses – Notification and Other Requirements
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0573 (HB0735)
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification – Correctional Officers, Law Enforcement Officers, and Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel (Hometown Heroes Act)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0606 (HB0456)
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Kent County
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0651 (HB0085)
Title
Baltimore County - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Detention and Correctional Officers
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0809 (HB1188)
Title
Office of the Attorney General – Correctional Ombudsman
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0813 (HB1199)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - COVID-19
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0826 (HB0538)
Title
Handgun Permits – Qualifications – High–Risk Occupations
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0085 (SB0651) Baltimore County - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Detention and Correctional Officers Delegate Bhandari 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0131 Correctional Services – Step–Down Programs – Cause of Action Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0456 (SB0606) Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Kent County Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Appropriations
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0538 (SB0826) Handgun Permits – Qualifications – High–Risk Occupations Delegate Hartman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0735 (SB0573) Income Tax Subtraction Modification – Correctional Officers, Law Enforcement Officers, and Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel (Hometown Heroes Act) Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0737 (SB0570) Emergency Services – Exposure to Contagious Diseases and Viruses – Notification and Other Requirements Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0765 Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – Novel Coronavirus (Essential Workers’ Compensation Act) Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0791 Military Service Credit - Eligibility Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0951 (SB0370) Income Tax Subtraction Modification – Military and Public Safety Retirement Income Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1188 (SB0809) Office of the Attorney General – Correctional Ombudsman Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB1199 (SB0813) Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – COVID–19 Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1321 Labor and Employment - Right to Work Delegate Novotny 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/05/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0044 Correctional Officers - Age Requirement Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/14 at 11:30 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2021 - 11:30 AM
SB0277 Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officer - Definition and Limitation on Credit Amount Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/14/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0370 (HB0951) Income Tax Subtraction Modification – Military and Public Safety Retirement Income Senator Peters 2 2 In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0570 (HB0737) Emergency Services – Exposure to Contagious Diseases and Viruses – Notification and Other Requirements President 3 2 In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Finance
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0573 (HB0735) Income Tax Subtraction Modification – Correctional Officers, Law Enforcement Officers, and Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel (Hometown Heroes Act) President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/10/2021 - 2:00 PM
SB0606 (HB0456) Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Kent County Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2021 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
SB0651 (HB0085) Baltimore County - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Detention and Correctional Officers Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0809 (HB1188) Office of the Attorney General – Correctional Ombudsman Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0813 (HB1199) Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - COVID-19 Senator Klausmeier 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0826 (HB0538) Handgun Permits – Qualifications – High–Risk Occupations Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2021 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/9/2021 11:18 AM
Click to return on the top page