Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Cooperative Associations

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0058 (SB0386)
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0254 /CH0138
Title
Prince George's County - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies PG 403-20
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0759 /CH0314
Title
Historic Revitalization Tax Credit – Expansion – Rehabilitations of Common Elements of Condominiums and Cooperative Projects
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0999 /CH0606 (SB0540)
Title
Member-Regulated Cooperatives - Establishment (Rural Broadband for the Eastern Shore Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1019 (SB0529)
Title
Public Service Commission - Electric Companies and Electric Cooperatives - Customer Identification
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0386 (HB0058)
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0529 (HB1019)
Title
Public Service Commission - Electric Companies and Electric Cooperatives - Customer Identification
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0540 (HB0999/CH0606)
Title
Member-Regulated Cooperatives - Establishment (Rural Broadband for the Eastern Shore Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0559 (HB0418)
Title
Frederick County - Solar Energy - Municipal Electric Utilities
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0058 (SB0386) Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0254 /CH0138 Prince George's County - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies PG 403-20 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 138
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0759 /CH0314 Historic Revitalization Tax Credit – Expansion – Rehabilitations of Common Elements of Condominiums and Cooperative Projects Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 314
Ways and Means
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0999 /CH0606 (SB0540) Member-Regulated Cooperatives - Establishment (Rural Broadband for the Eastern Shore Act of 2020) Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 606
Economic Matters
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1019 (SB0529) Public Service Commission - Electric Companies and Electric Cooperatives - Customer Identification Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
SB0386 (HB0058) Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0529 (HB1019) Public Service Commission - Electric Companies and Electric Cooperatives - Customer Identification Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0540 (HB0999/CH0606) Member-Regulated Cooperatives - Establishment (Rural Broadband for the Eastern Shore Act of 2020) Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0559 (HB0418) Frederick County - Solar Energy - Municipal Electric Utilities Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/14/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:16 PM