Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Consumer Price Index

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0375 (SB0211)
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0403
Title
Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0924
Title
Real Property - Mobile Home Parks - Rent Increases
Sponsor
Delegate Arikan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1123 (SB0563)
Title
Local Health Departments – Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0211 (HB0375)
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0563 (HB1123)
Title
Local Health Departments - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0949
Title
Public Utilities – Bills for Electricity Service – Meter Reading
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0375 (SB0211) Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2021) Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0403 Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0924 Real Property - Mobile Home Parks - Rent Increases Delegate Arikan 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB1123 (SB0563) Local Health Departments – Funding Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0211 (HB0375) Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2021) Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/28/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0563 (HB1123) Local Health Departments - Funding Senator Griffith 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0949 Public Utilities – Bills for Electricity Service – Meter Reading Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/13/2021 1:06 PM
Click to return on the top page