Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Congress, U.S.

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0341 (SB0266)
Title
Redistricting Reform Act of 2020 – Constitutional Amendment
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0346 (SB0284)
Title
Redistricting Reform Act of 2020
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1431 (SB0967)
Title
Legislative and Congressional Districts – Criteria and Open Hearing Process (Fair Maps Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1460
Title
Congressional Districts - Standards (Anti-Gerrymandering of Maryland's Congressional Districts)
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1491
Title
Congressional Districts - Standards (Anti-Gerrymandering of Maryland's Congressional Districts)
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1503
Title
Election Law - Congressional Representatives - Residence Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0005
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Congressional Term Limits Amendment
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0008
Title
United States of America - District of Columbia - Statehood
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0011
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal Power
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0266 (HB0341)
Title
Redistricting Reform Act of 2020 – Constitutional Amendment
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0284 (HB0346)
Title
Redistricting Reform Act of 2020
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0967 (HB1431)
Title
Legislative and Congressional Districts – Criteria and Open Hearing Process (Fair Maps Act)
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0005
Title
Congressional Action - Surprise Billing - Air Ambulance
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0341 (SB0266) Redistricting Reform Act of 2020 – Constitutional Amendment Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB0346 (SB0284) Redistricting Reform Act of 2020 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB1431 (SB0967) Legislative and Congressional Districts – Criteria and Open Hearing Process (Fair Maps Act) Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB1460 Congressional Districts - Standards (Anti-Gerrymandering of Maryland's Congressional Districts) Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB1491 Congressional Districts - Standards (Anti-Gerrymandering of Maryland's Congressional Districts) Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB1503 Election Law - Congressional Representatives - Residence Requirement Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HJ0005 United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Congressional Term Limits Amendment Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2020 - 2:00 PM
HJ0008 United States of America - District of Columbia - Statehood Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2020 - 2:00 PM
HJ0011 United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal Power Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB0266 (HB0341) Redistricting Reform Act of 2020 – Constitutional Amendment President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0284 (HB0346) Redistricting Reform Act of 2020 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0967 (HB1431) Legislative and Congressional Districts – Criteria and Open Hearing Process (Fair Maps Act) Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
SJ0005 Congressional Action - Surprise Billing - Air Ambulance Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/18/2020 9:39 AM