Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Commuters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0167
Title
Higher Education - State Payments to Private Institutions - Unserved Student Populations
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0390 (SB0548)
Title
Transportation - I-270 Commuter Bus Route Study
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0513
Title
Transportation - Toll Discount Plans - Francis Scott Key Bridge
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0519
Title
Transportation - Francis Scott Key Bridge - Commuter Toll Discount Plan
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0876 (SB0668)
Title
Transportation - Purple Line Marketing Program (Purple Line Marketing Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1159
Title
Central Maryland Regional Transit Plan and Commission - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1236
Title
Transit - Maryland Area Regional Commuter Train - Expansion of Service
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1367
Title
Transportation - Western Maryland MARC Rail Extension - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1440 (SB0705/CH0577)
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Disabled Reduced Fare Program - Opioid Treatment Program Patients
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1526
Title
Transportation Carbon Reduction Fund – Establishment (Transportation Carbon Fund Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0013 (HB0056/CH0611)
Title
Chesapeake Bay Bridge – Reconstruction Advisory Group
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0108
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Qualified Commuters
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0548 (HB0390)
Title
Transportation - I-270 Commuter Bus Route Study
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0668 (HB0876)
Title
Purple Line Marketing Act
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0705 /CH0577 (HB1440)
Title
Maryland Transit Administration – Disabled Reduced Fare Program – Opioid Treatment Program Patients
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0167 Higher Education - State Payments to Private Institutions - Unserved Student Populations Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0390 (SB0548) Transportation - I-270 Commuter Bus Route Study Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0513 Transportation - Toll Discount Plans - Francis Scott Key Bridge Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0519 Transportation - Francis Scott Key Bridge - Commuter Toll Discount Plan Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0876 (SB0668) Transportation - Purple Line Marketing Program (Purple Line Marketing Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1159 Central Maryland Regional Transit Plan and Commission - Alterations Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1236 Transit - Maryland Area Regional Commuter Train - Expansion of Service Delegate Solomon 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1367 Transportation - Western Maryland MARC Rail Extension - Study Delegate Corderman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Finance
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1440 (SB0705/CH0577) Maryland Transit Administration - Disabled Reduced Fare Program - Opioid Treatment Program Patients Delegate Wells 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1526 Transportation Carbon Reduction Fund – Establishment (Transportation Carbon Fund Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0013 (HB0056/CH0611) Chesapeake Bay Bridge – Reconstruction Advisory Group Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Finance
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0108 Income Tax - Credit for Qualified Commuters Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/15/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0548 (HB0390) Transportation - I-270 Commuter Bus Route Study Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0668 (HB0876) Purple Line Marketing Act Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Finance
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0705 /CH0577 (HB1440) Maryland Transit Administration – Disabled Reduced Fare Program – Opioid Treatment Program Patients Senator Carter 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 577
Finance
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:23 PM