Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Cigarettes -see also- Smoking and Vaping

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0001 /CH0041 (SB0001/CH0042)
Title
Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Funding
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1011 (SB0410)
Title
Cigarettes, Other Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices - Local Law Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0001 /CH0042 (HB0001/CH0041)
Title
Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0378
Title
Baltimore City - Cigarettes, Other Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices - Local Laws Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0410 (HB1011)
Title
Cigarettes, Other Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices - Local Law Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0787 (HB1200)
Title
Digital Advertising Gross Revenues, Income, Sales and Use, and Tobacco Taxes - Alterations and Implementation
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0001 /CH0041 (SB0001/CH0042) Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Funding Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Appropriations
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1011 (SB0410) Cigarettes, Other Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices - Local Law Authorization Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0001 /CH0042 (HB0001/CH0041) Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Funding Senator Sydnor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 42
Budget and Taxation
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Appropriations
3/05/2021 - 12:00 PM
SB0378 Baltimore City - Cigarettes, Other Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices - Local Laws Authorization Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0410 (HB1011) Cigarettes, Other Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices - Local Law Authorization Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0787 (HB1200) Digital Advertising Gross Revenues, Income, Sales and Use, and Tobacco Taxes - Alterations and Implementation Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 8:29 PM
Click to return on the top page