Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Chesapeake Bay Restoration

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0078 /CH0044 (SB0172)
Title
Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0177 /CH0097
Title
Environment – Water Infrastructure Assets – Authorization of Emergency Actions
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0687 /CH0304 (SB0597/CH0305)
Title
Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Fixed Natural Filter Practices
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1035 /CH0413 (SB0495)
Title
Bay Restoration Fund – Use of Funds – Municipal Wastewater Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0019
Title
Agriculture - Management-Intensive Farming and Grazing
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0172 (HB0078/CH0044)
Title
Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0495 (HB1035/CH0413)
Title
Bay Restoration Fund - Use of Funds - Municipal Wastewater Facilities
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0597 /CH0305 (HB0687/CH0304)
Title
Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Fixed Natural Filter Practices
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0671
Title
Bay Restoration Fund - Allocation of Fees, Authorized Uses, and County Authority to Incur Indebtedness
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0078 /CH0044 (SB0172) Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses Delegate Watson, C. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 44
Environment and Transportation
1/29/2020 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0177 /CH0097 Environment – Water Infrastructure Assets – Authorization of Emergency Actions Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 97
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2020 - 11:00 AM
HB0687 /CH0304 (SB0597/CH0305) Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Fixed Natural Filter Practices Delegate Stein 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 304
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1035 /CH0413 (SB0495) Bay Restoration Fund – Use of Funds – Municipal Wastewater Facilities Delegate Adams 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 413
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0019 Agriculture - Management-Intensive Farming and Grazing Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0172 (HB0078/CH0044) Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses Senator Hester 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0495 (HB1035/CH0413) Bay Restoration Fund - Use of Funds - Municipal Wastewater Facilities Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0597 /CH0305 (HB0687/CH0304) Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Fixed Natural Filter Practices Senator Young 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 305
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0671 Bay Restoration Fund - Allocation of Fees, Authorized Uses, and County Authority to Incur Indebtedness Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/8/2020 2:06 PM