Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Carroll County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0173 /CH0095
Title
Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0570 /CH0256 (SB0366/CH0257)
Title
Carroll County - Education - Junior Reserve Officer Training Corps Instructors
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0571 /CH0258 (SB0238/CH0259)
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hours and Days for Consumption and Sale
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0610 (SB0995)
Title
Carroll County - Contracts and Purchases
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0645 (SB0461/CH0285)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1300 (SB1000)
Title
Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1385
Title
Town of Mount Airy (Carroll County and Frederick County) - Urban Renewal Authority
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1465 (SB0955)
Title
Federal Clean Water Act - Authority of State
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0238 /CH0259 (HB0571/CH0258)
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hours and Days for Consumption and Sale
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0366 /CH0257 (HB0570/CH0256)
Title
Carroll County - Education - Junior Reserve Officer Training Corps Instructors
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0461 /CH0285 (HB0645)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0960 /CH0588 (HB0683)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Membership and Benefits
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0995 (HB0610)
Title
Carroll County - Contracts and Purchases
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1000 (HB1300)
Title
Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1023
Title
Carroll County - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0173 /CH0095 Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 95
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2020 - 11:00 AM
HB0570 /CH0256 (SB0366/CH0257) Carroll County - Education - Junior Reserve Officer Training Corps Instructors Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 256
Ways and Means
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0571 /CH0258 (SB0238/CH0259) Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hours and Days for Consumption and Sale Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 258
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0610 (SB0995) Carroll County - Contracts and Purchases Carroll County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0645 (SB0461/CH0285) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1300 (SB1000) Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation Speaker 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Appropriations
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Ways and Means
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
HB1385 Town of Mount Airy (Carroll County and Frederick County) - Urban Renewal Authority Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1465 (SB0955) Federal Clean Water Act - Authority of State Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0238 /CH0259 (HB0571/CH0258) Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hours and Days for Consumption and Sale Carroll County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 259
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0366 /CH0257 (HB0570/CH0256) Carroll County - Education - Junior Reserve Officer Training Corps Instructors Senator Ready 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 257
Finance
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0461 /CH0285 (HB0645) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond Carroll County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 285
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0960 /CH0588 (HB0683) State Retirement and Pension System - Membership and Benefits Senator Hettleman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 588
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2020 - 8:30 AM
Appropriations
SB0995 (HB0610) Carroll County - Contracts and Purchases Carroll County Senators 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB1000 (HB1300) Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB1023 Carroll County - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/13/2020 2:16 PM