Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Calvert County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0173 /CH0095
Title
Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0387 /CH0191 (SB0805/CH0192)
Title
Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0443 /CH0209 (SB0430/CH0210)
Title
Southern Maryland Code Counties - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0482 /CH0218 (SB0428/CH0219)
Title
Southern Maryland - Homeowners Association Commission - Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0783 (SB0343/CH0326)
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1060 /CH0414
Title
Calvert County - Speed Limits - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1234
Title
County Boards of Education - Student Transportation - Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1300 (SB1000)
Title
Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1353
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Severance Tax - Increase
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1467
Title
Calvert County - Criminal Law - Refusal or Failure to Leave Public Building or Grounds
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1479 /CH0480
Title
Calvert County - Subdivision Plats - Stormwater Management Easements
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1556 /CH0486
Title
Calvert County - Procurement - Contract Renewal
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0343 /CH0326 (HB0783)
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0428 /CH0219 (HB0482/CH0218)
Title
Southern Maryland - Homeowners Association Commission - Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0430 /CH0210 (HB0443/CH0209)
Title
Southern Maryland Code Counties - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0805 /CH0192 (HB0387/CH0191)
Title
Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1000 (HB1300)
Title
Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0173 /CH0095 Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 95
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2020 - 11:00 AM
HB0387 /CH0191 (SB0805/CH0192) Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding Charles County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 191
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0443 /CH0209 (SB0430/CH0210) Southern Maryland Code Counties - Collective Bargaining Charles County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 209
Appropriations
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0482 /CH0218 (SB0428/CH0219) Southern Maryland - Homeowners Association Commission - Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority Charles County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 218
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0783 (SB0343/CH0326) Calvert County - Public Facilities Bond Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1060 /CH0414 Calvert County - Speed Limits - Establishment Delegate Clark 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 414
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1234 County Boards of Education - Student Transportation - Vehicles Delegate Adams 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1300 (SB1000) Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation Speaker 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Appropriations
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Ways and Means
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
HB1353 Natural Resources - Oyster Severance Tax - Increase Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1467 Calvert County - Criminal Law - Refusal or Failure to Leave Public Building or Grounds Calvert County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1479 /CH0480 Calvert County - Subdivision Plats - Stormwater Management Easements Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 480
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1556 /CH0486 Calvert County - Procurement - Contract Renewal Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 486
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0343 /CH0326 (HB0783) Calvert County - Public Facilities Bond Senator Bailey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 326
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0428 /CH0219 (HB0482/CH0218) Southern Maryland - Homeowners Association Commission - Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority Charles County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 219
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2020 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0430 /CH0210 (HB0443/CH0209) Southern Maryland Code Counties - Collective Bargaining Charles County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 210
Finance
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0805 /CH0192 (HB0387/CH0191) Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding Charles County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 192
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2020 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB1000 (HB1300) Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/14/2020 12:46 PM