Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Blind Persons

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0235 (SB0120)
Title
State Government - Department of Information Technology - Cybersecurity
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0557 /CH0252 (SB0607/CH0253)
Title
Motor Scooter and Electric Low Speed Scooter Sharing Companies – Nonvisual Access
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0604 /CH0272 (SB0326/CH0273)
Title
State Libraries - Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped and State Library Board - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Forbes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0649
Title
State Finance and Procurement – Procedures and Pricing and Selection Committee for Preferred Providers
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0760 /CH0315 (SB0640/CH0316)
Title
Maryland School for the Blind - Board of Directors - Reappointments
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1091 (SB0863)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Long-Term Care Services and Supports - Personal Needs Allowance
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1167
Title
Hunting and Fishing Licenses - Discounts, Complimentary Licenses, and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1652
Title
Maryland Sign Language Interpreter Act
Sponsor
Delegate Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0326 /CH0273 (HB0604/CH0272)
Title
State Libraries - Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped and State Library Board - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0607 /CH0253 (HB0557/CH0252)
Title
Motor Scooter and Electric Low Speed Scooter Sharing Companies – Nonvisual Access
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0610
Title
Community Colleges - Supplemental Services and Supports for Students With Disabilities Grant Program
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0640 /CH0316 (HB0760/CH0315)
Title
Maryland School for the Blind - Board of Directors - Reappointments
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0863 (HB1091)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Long-Term Care Services and Supports - Personal Needs Allowance
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0235 (SB0120) State Government - Department of Information Technology - Cybersecurity Delegate Carey 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0557 /CH0252 (SB0607/CH0253) Motor Scooter and Electric Low Speed Scooter Sharing Companies – Nonvisual Access Delegate Attar 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 252
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0604 /CH0272 (SB0326/CH0273) State Libraries - Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped and State Library Board - Alterations Delegate Forbes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 272
Ways and Means
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0649 State Finance and Procurement – Procedures and Pricing and Selection Committee for Preferred Providers Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0760 /CH0315 (SB0640/CH0316) Maryland School for the Blind - Board of Directors - Reappointments Delegate Smith 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 315
Appropriations
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1091 (SB0863) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Long-Term Care Services and Supports - Personal Needs Allowance Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1167 Hunting and Fishing Licenses - Discounts, Complimentary Licenses, and Reporting Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1652 Maryland Sign Language Interpreter Act Delegate Kittleman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0326 /CH0273 (HB0604/CH0272) State Libraries - Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped and State Library Board - Alterations Senator King 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 273
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0607 /CH0253 (HB0557/CH0252) Motor Scooter and Electric Low Speed Scooter Sharing Companies – Nonvisual Access Senator Benson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 253
Finance
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0610 Community Colleges - Supplemental Services and Supports for Students With Disabilities Grant Program Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0640 /CH0316 (HB0760/CH0315) Maryland School for the Blind - Board of Directors - Reappointments Senator Guzzone 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 316
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0863 (HB1091) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Long-Term Care Services and Supports - Personal Needs Allowance Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Finance
2/28/2020 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/6/2020 2:04 PM