Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Birds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0173 /CH0095
Title
Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0192 (SB0299)
Title
Department of General Services - Energy-Conserving Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0955
Title
Snare Traps – Prohibition Against Sale or Possession – Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1296 (SB1014)
Title
Hunting - Regulated Shooting Areas - Offshore Stationary Blinds and Blind Sites
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1436 (SB0426)
Title
Baltimore County - Hunting - Nongame Birds and Mammals
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0009 /CH0496
Title
Agriculture - Maryland Egg Law - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0242 /CH0542
Title
Natural Resources - Wild Waterfowl Policy - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0243
Title
Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting - Migratory Game Birds
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0299 (HB0192)
Title
Department of General Services - Energy-Conserving Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0426 (HB1436)
Title
Baltimore County - Hunting - Nongame Birds and Mammals
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0500 (HB1129)
Title
Talbot County - Turkey and Deer Hunting - Sundays
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0930
Title
Natural Resources - Resident Canada Geese - Restrictions on Shooting in Charles County
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1014 (HB1296)
Title
Hunting - Regulated Shooting Areas - Offshore Stationary Blinds and Blind Sites
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0173 /CH0095 Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 95
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2020 - 11:00 AM
HB0192 (SB0299) Department of General Services - Energy-Conserving Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2020) Delegate Hill 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0955 Snare Traps – Prohibition Against Sale or Possession – Alterations Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1296 (SB1014) Hunting - Regulated Shooting Areas - Offshore Stationary Blinds and Blind Sites Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1436 (SB0426) Baltimore County - Hunting - Nongame Birds and Mammals Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
SB0009 /CH0496 Agriculture - Maryland Egg Law - Revisions Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 496
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2020 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0242 /CH0542 Natural Resources - Wild Waterfowl Policy - Repeal Senator Bailey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 542
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0243 Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting - Migratory Game Birds Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0299 (HB0192) Department of General Services - Energy-Conserving Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2020) Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0426 (HB1436) Baltimore County - Hunting - Nongame Birds and Mammals Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0500 (HB1129) Talbot County - Turkey and Deer Hunting - Sundays Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0930 Natural Resources - Resident Canada Geese - Restrictions on Shooting in Charles County Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB1014 (HB1296) Hunting - Regulated Shooting Areas - Offshore Stationary Blinds and Blind Sites Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/27/2020 12:54 PM