Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Beverage Containers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0296
Title
Environment - Single-Use Plastic Straws - Use in a Food Service Business
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0651 (SB0360)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MT (Movie Theater) License
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0777 /CH0322 (SB0792/CH0323)
Title
Kent County Alcohol Act of 2020
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0786 (SB0643/CH0573)
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2020
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0824
Title
Beverage Container Deposit Program - Establishment and Advisory Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0864 /CH0350 (SB0375/CH0351)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel Lobby License
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1319 /CH0459
Title
Wicomico County – Alcoholic Beverages – Board of License Commissioners
Sponsor
Delegate Anderton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0360 (HB0651)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MT (Movie Theater) License
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0375 /CH0351 (HB0864/CH0350)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel Lobby License
Sponsor
Harford County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0643 /CH0573 (HB0786)
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2020
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0792 /CH0323 (HB0777/CH0322)
Title
Kent County Alcohol Act of 2020
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1068
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Fulfillment Warehouse Permit
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0296 Environment - Single-Use Plastic Straws - Use in a Food Service Business Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB0651 (SB0360) Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MT (Movie Theater) License Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0777 /CH0322 (SB0792/CH0323) Kent County Alcohol Act of 2020 Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 322
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0786 (SB0643/CH0573) Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2020 Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0824 Beverage Container Deposit Program - Establishment and Advisory Commission Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0864 /CH0350 (SB0375/CH0351) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel Lobby License Harford County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 350
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1319 /CH0459 Wicomico County – Alcoholic Beverages – Board of License Commissioners Delegate Anderton 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 459
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0360 (HB0651) Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MT (Movie Theater) License Senator Beidle 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0375 /CH0351 (HB0864/CH0350) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel Lobby License Harford County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 351
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0643 /CH0573 (HB0786) Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2020 Senator Edwards 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 573
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0792 /CH0323 (HB0777/CH0322) Kent County Alcohol Act of 2020 Senator Hershey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 323
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1068 Alcoholic Beverages - Fulfillment Warehouse Permit Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/14/2020 12:34 PM