Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Beneficiaries -see also- Estates and Trusts

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0055 (SB0998)
Title
Vessels - Certificate of Title - Transfer-on-Death Beneficiary Designation
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0060
Title
Local Pension Systems - Special Disability Retirement Allowance
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0532 (SB0615)
Title
Maryland Senator Edward J. Kasemeyer College Investment Plan - State Contributions - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0629
Title
Maryland College Investment Plan - State Contribution Incentives
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0885
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Duties and Obligations
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0904 /CH0361 (SB0886/CH0362)
Title
Maryland Trust Act - Liability of Trustee - Report and Release by Interested Party
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0943 (SB0871)
Title
Mail Order and Specialty Drugs - Physician Dispensing
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1165 (SB0484)
Title
Health Insurance - Provider Panels - Coverage for Nonparticipating Providers
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1201
Title
State Government - Maryland Reparations Commission - Establishment (Harriet Tubman Community Investment Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1307 /CH0455 (SB1017)
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers – Credentialing and Reimbursement
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1404
Title
Public Ethics – Financial Disclosure – Requirements (Conflicts of Interest Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0462 /CH0556 (HB0634)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System – Death Benefits for Children
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0484 (HB1165)
Title
Health Insurance - Provider Panels - Coverage for Nonparticipating Providers
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0556
Title
Insurance - Product and Service Offerings
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0615 (HB0532)
Title
Maryland Senator Edward J. Kasemeyer College Investment Plan - State Contributions - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871 (HB0943)
Title
Mail Order and Specialty Drugs - Physician Dispensing
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0886 /CH0362 (HB0904/CH0361)
Title
Maryland Trust Act - Liability of Trustee - Report and Release by Interested Party
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0998 (HB0055)
Title
Vessels - Certificate of Title - Transfer-on-Death Beneficiary Designation
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1017 (HB1307/CH0455)
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Network Adequacy and Reimbursement
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0055 (SB0998) Vessels - Certificate of Title - Transfer-on-Death Beneficiary Designation Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
1/29/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB0060 Local Pension Systems - Special Disability Retirement Allowance Delegate Jackson, M. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0532 (SB0615) Maryland Senator Edward J. Kasemeyer College Investment Plan - State Contributions - Alterations Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB0629 Maryland College Investment Plan - State Contribution Incentives Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0885 Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Duties and Obligations Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0904 /CH0361 (SB0886/CH0362) Maryland Trust Act - Liability of Trustee - Report and Release by Interested Party Delegate Cardin 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 361
Judiciary
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0943 (SB0871) Mail Order and Specialty Drugs - Physician Dispensing Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1165 (SB0484) Health Insurance - Provider Panels - Coverage for Nonparticipating Providers Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1201 State Government - Maryland Reparations Commission - Establishment (Harriet Tubman Community Investment Act) Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1307 /CH0455 (SB1017) Pharmacy Benefits Managers – Credentialing and Reimbursement Delegate Kipke 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 455
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1404 Public Ethics – Financial Disclosure – Requirements (Conflicts of Interest Act) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0462 /CH0556 (HB0634) State Retirement and Pension System – Death Benefits for Children Senator Elfreth 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 556
Budget and Taxation
2/06/2020 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
SB0484 (HB1165) Health Insurance - Provider Panels - Coverage for Nonparticipating Providers Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0556 Insurance - Product and Service Offerings Senator Beidle 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0615 (HB0532) Maryland Senator Edward J. Kasemeyer College Investment Plan - State Contributions - Alterations Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the House - First Reading Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0871 (HB0943) Mail Order and Specialty Drugs - Physician Dispensing Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0886 /CH0362 (HB0904/CH0361) Maryland Trust Act - Liability of Trustee - Report and Release by Interested Party Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 362
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2020 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0998 (HB0055) Vessels - Certificate of Title - Transfer-on-Death Beneficiary Designation Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1017 (HB1307/CH0455) Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Network Adequacy and Reimbursement Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Finance
3/16/2020 - 10:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/13/2020 4:05 PM