Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Awards, Medals and Prizes -see also- Gaming

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0131 (SB0059)
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations ("ITLM" for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0190 (SB0348)
Title
Public Ethics - Officials and Lobbyists - Reporting of Ceremonial Gifts and Awards of Insignificant Monetary Value
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0500
Title
State Lottery - Unclaimed Prizes - Distribution to Local Boards of Education
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0646 /CH0286
Title
Vehicle Registration - Special Plates for Veterans - Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1051 (SB0910)
Title
Public Health - Solemn Covenant of the States to Award Prizes for Curing Diseases - Compact
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113
Title
State Finance and Procurement – Procurement Improvement Council – Form for Discussion and Report on the Required Use of eMaryland Marketplace
Sponsor
Delegate Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0059 (HB0131)
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations ("Slots" for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0348 (HB0190)
Title
Public Ethics - Officials and Lobbyists - Reporting of Ceremonial Gifts and Awards of Insignificant Monetary Value
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0910 (HB1051)
Title
Public Health - Solemn Covenant of the States to Award Prizes for Curing Diseases - Compact
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0984
Title
Department of General Services - State Innovation Program and Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0131 (SB0059) State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations ("ITLM" for Homeless Veterans Act) Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
1/30/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0190 (SB0348) Public Ethics - Officials and Lobbyists - Reporting of Ceremonial Gifts and Awards of Insignificant Monetary Value Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0500 State Lottery - Unclaimed Prizes - Distribution to Local Boards of Education Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0646 /CH0286 Vehicle Registration - Special Plates for Veterans - Fees Delegate Young, P. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 286
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1051 (SB0910) Public Health - Solemn Covenant of the States to Award Prizes for Curing Diseases - Compact Delegate Johnson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1113 State Finance and Procurement – Procurement Improvement Council – Form for Discussion and Report on the Required Use of eMaryland Marketplace Delegate Charles 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0059 (HB0131) State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations ("Slots" for Homeless Veterans Act) Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/09/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB0348 (HB0190) Public Ethics - Officials and Lobbyists - Reporting of Ceremonial Gifts and Awards of Insignificant Monetary Value Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0910 (HB1051) Public Health - Solemn Covenant of the States to Award Prizes for Curing Diseases - Compact Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0984 Department of General Services - State Innovation Program and Fund - Establishment Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/6/2020 2:01 PM