Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Audiologists and Speech Pathologists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0515
Title
Public Schools - Staff Members - Report
Sponsor
Delegate Cain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1102 (SB0766)
Title
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Maryland Music Therapists Act
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1112 (SB0416)
Title
Audiology and Speech-Language Pathology Interstate Compact
Sponsor
Delegate Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1375
Title
Public School Students - Vision Services and the Vision for Maryland Program
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1557
Title
Public Schools - Health Services - County Boards of Education and Health Departments
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1648 (SB1064)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0416 (HB1112)
Title
Audiology and Speech-Language Pathology Interstate Compact
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0766 (HB1102)
Title
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Maryland Music Therapists Act
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1064 (HB1648)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0515 Public Schools - Staff Members - Report Delegate Cain 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Ways and Means
2/14/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1102 (SB0766) State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Maryland Music Therapists Act Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1112 (SB0416) Audiology and Speech-Language Pathology Interstate Compact Delegate Charles 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1375 Public School Students - Vision Services and the Vision for Maryland Program Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1557 Public Schools - Health Services - County Boards of Education and Health Departments Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1648 (SB1064) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0416 (HB1112) Audiology and Speech-Language Pathology Interstate Compact Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0766 (HB1102) State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Maryland Music Therapists Act Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB1064 (HB1648) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Finance
3/16/2020 - 10:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/14/2020 12:49 PM