Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Assessments

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0002 (SB0002)
Title
Maryland Environmental Service Reform Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0114 (SB0199)
Title
Transportation - Maryland Transit Administration Funding and MARC Rail Extension Study (Transit Safety and Investment Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0540 (SB0139)
Title
Interstate Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0557
Title
Homestead Property Tax Credit - Calculation of Credit for Dwelling Purchased by First-Time Homebuyer
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0589 (SB0493)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2021
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0736 (SB0571)
Title
Interstate Licensed Professional Counselors Compact
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0825
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations - Dispute Settlement and Eviction Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0949
Title
Campaign Finance - Collections by Membership Entities - Noncampaign Political Activity
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0954 (SB0841)
Title
Property Tax – Solar Energy Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0970 (SB0500)
Title
Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1037
Title
Election Law - Websites - Reporting of Political Censorship
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1120
Title
Property Tax – Special Use Assessment of Country Clubs and Golf Courses – Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1279 (SB0778)
Title
Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1290 (SB0782)
Title
State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Real Property Assessments and Appeals
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0130
Title
Landlord and Tenant – Failure to Pay Rent – Fee Limit During Emergencies
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0139 (HB0540)
Title
Interstate Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0174
Title
Property Tax Assessments – 5–Year Assessment Cycle
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0199 (HB0114)
Title
Transportation - Maryland Transit Administration Funding and MARC Rail Extension Study (Transit Safety and Investment Act)
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0230
Title
Maryland Port Administration - Land Acquisition and Payment to Counties
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0500 (HB0970)
Title
Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0571 (HB0736)
Title
Interstate Licensed Professional Counselors Compact
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0778 (HB1279)
Title
Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program – Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0782 (HB1290)
Title
State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Real Property Assessments and Appeals
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0841 (HB0954)
Title
Property Tax - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0002 (SB0002) Maryland Environmental Service Reform Act of 2021 Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Appropriations
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0114 (SB0199) Transportation - Maryland Transit Administration Funding and MARC Rail Extension Study (Transit Safety and Investment Act) Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Appropriations
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0540 (SB0139) Interstate Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact Delegate Morgan 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0557 Homestead Property Tax Credit - Calculation of Credit for Dwelling Purchased by First-Time Homebuyer Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0589 (SB0493) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2021 Speaker 3 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Appropriations
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0736 (SB0571) Interstate Licensed Professional Counselors Compact Speaker 3 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0825 Cooperative Housing Corporations - Dispute Settlement and Eviction Procedures Delegate Healey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0949 Campaign Finance - Collections by Membership Entities - Noncampaign Political Activity Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0954 (SB0841) Property Tax – Solar Energy Systems Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0970 (SB0500) Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact Delegate Johnson 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1037 Election Law - Websites - Reporting of Political Censorship Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1120 Property Tax – Special Use Assessment of Country Clubs and Golf Courses – Repeal Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1279 (SB0778) Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program - Alterations Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1290 (SB0782) State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Real Property Assessments and Appeals Delegate Amprey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0130 Landlord and Tenant – Failure to Pay Rent – Fee Limit During Emergencies Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0139 (HB0540) Interstate Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0174 Property Tax Assessments – 5–Year Assessment Cycle Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0199 (HB0114) Transportation - Maryland Transit Administration Funding and MARC Rail Extension Study (Transit Safety and Investment Act) Senator McCray 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (104-34)
Budget and Taxation
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0230 Maryland Port Administration - Land Acquisition and Payment to Counties Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/19/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0500 (HB0970) Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0571 (HB0736) Interstate Licensed Professional Counselors Compact President 3 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0778 (HB1279) Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program – Alterations Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2021 - 12:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0782 (HB1290) State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Real Property Assessments and Appeals Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2021 - 12:00 PM
SB0841 (HB0954) Property Tax - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2021 - 12:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 3:48 PM
Click to return on the top page