Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Archives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0119
Title
Commission on African American Patriots in the American Revolutionary War
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0401 (SB0758)
Title
Public Information Act - Remote Access, Fee Complaints, Fee Waivers, and Inspection of Judicial Records (Open Government, Better Government Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0421 /CH0202 (SB0363/CH0203)
Title
State Government – Open Meetings – Requirements and Application of Open Meetings Act (Maryland State Agency Transparency Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0502 (SB0590)
Title
Public Information Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0751
Title
State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners - License and Registration - Criminal History Records Checks
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1071 (SB0696)
Title
Public Health - Substance-Related Disorder Services (Maryland Patient Protection and Treatment Ethics Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Pippy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1201
Title
State Government - Maryland Reparations Commission - Establishment (Harriet Tubman Community Investment Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1299
Title
Public Health - Abortions - Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0012
Title
Commission to Rename Negro Mountain
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0088 /CH0029 (HB0021/CH0028)
Title
Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0363 /CH0203 (HB0421/CH0202)
Title
State Government - Open Meetings - Requirements and Application of Open Meetings Act (Maryland State Agency Transparency Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0463 /CH0557 (HB0753)
Title
State Retirement Agency - Monitoring and Recording of Automated Outgoing Telephone Calls - Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0590 (HB0502)
Title
Public Information Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0696 (HB1071)
Title
Public Health - Substance-Related Disorder Services (Maryland Patient Protection and Treatment Ethics Act)
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0758 (HB0401)
Title
Public Information Act - Remote Access, Fee Complaints, Fee Waivers, and Inspection of Judicial Records (Open Government, Better Government Act)
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0857
Title
Facial Recognition Services - Moratorium
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0119 Commission on African American Patriots in the American Revolutionary War Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB0401 (SB0758) Public Information Act - Remote Access, Fee Complaints, Fee Waivers, and Inspection of Judicial Records (Open Government, Better Government Act) Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary) and Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Judiciary
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0421 /CH0202 (SB0363/CH0203) State Government – Open Meetings – Requirements and Application of Open Meetings Act (Maryland State Agency Transparency Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 202
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0502 (SB0590) Public Information Act - Revisions Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0751 State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners - License and Registration - Criminal History Records Checks Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1071 (SB0696) Public Health - Substance-Related Disorder Services (Maryland Patient Protection and Treatment Ethics Act) Delegate Pippy 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1201 State Government - Maryland Reparations Commission - Establishment (Harriet Tubman Community Investment Act) Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1299 Public Health - Abortions - Modifications Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HJ0012 Commission to Rename Negro Mountain Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB0088 /CH0029 (HB0021/CH0028) Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum Senator Hayes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 29
Judicial Proceedings
1/09/2020 - 2:15 PM
Economic Matters
SB0363 /CH0203 (HB0421/CH0202) State Government - Open Meetings - Requirements and Application of Open Meetings Act (Maryland State Agency Transparency Act) Senator Kagan 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 203
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0463 /CH0557 (HB0753) State Retirement Agency - Monitoring and Recording of Automated Outgoing Telephone Calls - Authorization Senator Elfreth 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 557
Budget and Taxation
2/06/2020 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
SB0590 (HB0502) Public Information Act - Revisions Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0696 (HB1071) Public Health - Substance-Related Disorder Services (Maryland Patient Protection and Treatment Ethics Act) Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0758 (HB0401) Public Information Act - Remote Access, Fee Complaints, Fee Waivers, and Inspection of Judicial Records (Open Government, Better Government Act) Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2020 - 12:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0857 Facial Recognition Services - Moratorium Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/13/2020 4:00 PM