Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Arbitration -see also- Mediation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0086 (SB0136)
Title
Transportation - Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0189 /CH0100 (SB0167/CH0101)
Title
Insurance - Credit for Reinsurance Model Law - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0560 /CH0612 (SB0395/CH0613)
Title
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0809
Title
Montgomery County - Housing Opportunities Commission - Contracting Out Services - Requirements MC 21-20
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1554
Title
Baltimore City - Police Department - Collective Bargaining and Arbitration
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1623
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0016
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Master Electricians Guaranty Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0167 /CH0101 (HB0189/CH0100)
Title
Insurance - Credit for Reinsurance Model Law - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0395 /CH0613 (HB0560/CH0612)
Title
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0823
Title
Sheriff of Baltimore City - Salaries and Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1059
Title
Criminal Procedure - Restitution - Trauma-Informed Restorative Justice
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0086 (SB0136) Transportation - Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act - Alterations Delegate Korman 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Appropriations
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0189 /CH0100 (SB0167/CH0101) Insurance - Credit for Reinsurance Model Law - Revisions Delegate Dumais 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 100
Economic Matters
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Finance
HB0560 /CH0612 (SB0395/CH0613) State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 612
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0809 Montgomery County - Housing Opportunities Commission - Contracting Out Services - Requirements MC 21-20 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1554 Baltimore City - Police Department - Collective Bargaining and Arbitration Delegate Attar 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1623 Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0016 Business Occupations and Professions - Master Electricians Guaranty Fund - Establishment Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0167 /CH0101 (HB0189/CH0100) Insurance - Credit for Reinsurance Model Law - Revisions Senator Kelley 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 101
Finance
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0395 /CH0613 (HB0560/CH0612) State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 613
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0823 Sheriff of Baltimore City - Salaries and Collective Bargaining Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Finance
2/28/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB1059 Criminal Procedure - Restitution - Trauma-Informed Restorative Justice Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/13/2020 3:59 PM