Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Accountants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0592
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1053
Title
Real Property – Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Governing Bodies and Annual Meetings
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1563 (SB0879)
Title
Public Health – Maryland Infant Lifetime Care Trust Funded by HSCRC and Maryland Patient Safety Center Duties
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0004 /CH0492
Title
Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Sports and Event Wagering Referendum and Minority Business Enterprise Disparity Study
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0879 (HB1563)
Title
Public Health – Maryland Infant Lifetime Care Trust Funded by HSCRC and Maryland Patient Safety Center Duties
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0592 Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1053 Real Property – Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Governing Bodies and Annual Meetings Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1563 (SB0879) Public Health – Maryland Infant Lifetime Care Trust Funded by HSCRC and Maryland Patient Safety Center Duties Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/09/2020 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0004 /CH0492 Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Sports and Event Wagering Referendum and Minority Business Enterprise Disparity Study Senator Zucker 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 492
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0879 (HB1563) Public Health – Maryland Infant Lifetime Care Trust Funded by HSCRC and Maryland Patient Safety Center Duties Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/8/2020 3:38 PM