Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Abuse -see also- Child Abuse & Neg.; Elder Abuse & Neg., etc

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0033 /CH0034 (SB0153)
Title
Criminal Law - Abuse or Neglect of a Vulnerable Adult - Causing Severe Emotional Distress
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0057
Title
Animal Shelters - Standards of Operation
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0533 (SB0518)
Title
Higher Education – Council on the Fair Treatment of Student Athletes (Jordan McNair Safe and Fair Play Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0780 (SB0481)
Title
Criminal Law - Crime of Violence - Vulnerable Adult
Sponsor
Delegate Pippy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1282
Title
Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1527 (SB0833)
Title
Adult Protective Services - Vulnerable Adults Registry - Investigations and Records of Abuse and Neglect and Workgroup Study
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0153 (HB0033/CH0034)
Title
Criminal Law - Abuse or Neglect of a Vulnerable Adult - Causing Severe Emotional Distress
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0481 (HB0780)
Title
State Commission on Criminal Sentencing Policy – Annual Report – Crimes of Violence
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0518 (HB0533)
Title
Higher Education – Council on the Fair Treatment of Student Athletes (Jordan McNair Safe and Fair Play Act)
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0833 (HB1527)
Title
Adult Protective Services - Vulnerable Adults Registry - Investigations and Records of Abuse and Neglect and Workgroup Study
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0925
Title
Criminal Law - Dangerous and Potentially Dangerous Dogs - Classification and Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0033 /CH0034 (SB0153) Criminal Law - Abuse or Neglect of a Vulnerable Adult - Causing Severe Emotional Distress Delegate Guyton 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 34
Judiciary
1/21/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0057 Animal Shelters - Standards of Operation Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0533 (SB0518) Higher Education – Council on the Fair Treatment of Student Athletes (Jordan McNair Safe and Fair Play Act) Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0780 (SB0481) Criminal Law - Crime of Violence - Vulnerable Adult Delegate Pippy 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1282 Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1527 (SB0833) Adult Protective Services - Vulnerable Adults Registry - Investigations and Records of Abuse and Neglect and Workgroup Study Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0153 (HB0033/CH0034) Criminal Law - Abuse or Neglect of a Vulnerable Adult - Causing Severe Emotional Distress Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/22 at 3:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/22/2020 - 3:00 PM
SB0481 (HB0780) State Commission on Criminal Sentencing Policy – Annual Report – Crimes of Violence Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2020 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0518 (HB0533) Higher Education – Council on the Fair Treatment of Student Athletes (Jordan McNair Safe and Fair Play Act) Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0833 (HB1527) Adult Protective Services - Vulnerable Adults Registry - Investigations and Records of Abuse and Neglect and Workgroup Study Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0925 Criminal Law - Dangerous and Potentially Dangerous Dogs - Classification and Requirements Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2020 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/13/2020 4:10 PM