Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Ways And Means Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0199
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Termination
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0219 /CH0111
Title
Maryland Estate Tax - Portability
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0220
Title
Income Tax Credit - Employment of Apprentices - Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0199 Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Termination By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Ways and Means
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2020 - 11:00 AM
HB0219 /CH0111 Maryland Estate Tax - Portability By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 111
Ways and Means
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0220 Income Tax Credit - Employment of Apprentices - Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/1/2020 2:15 PM