Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Montgomery County Delegation & Prince George's Co Deleg

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0444
Title
Prince George's County Planning Board - Nontraditional Recreational Opportunities - Establishment and Fund MC/PG 104-21
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0464
Title
Maryland–National Capital Park and Planning Commission – Mandatory Referral Review MC/PG 101–21
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0491
Title
Maryland–National Capital Park and Planning Commission – Prince George’s County – Concrete Batching Plants – Setback Requirement MC/PG 106–21
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0501
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission – Board of Ethics – Financial Disclosure Statements – Late Fees MC/PG 102–21
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0516
Title
Bicounty Agencies – Prince George’s County – Use and Occupancy Permits – Notice Requirements MC/PG 107-21
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0789
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission – Video and Audio Streaming and Archiving Meetings and Financial Assistance MC/PG 100–21
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0444 Prince George's County Planning Board - Nontraditional Recreational Opportunities - Establishment and Fund MC/PG 104-21 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
3/19/2021 - 4:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/06/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0464 Maryland–National Capital Park and Planning Commission – Mandatory Referral Review MC/PG 101–21 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/06/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0491 Maryland–National Capital Park and Planning Commission – Prince George’s County – Concrete Batching Plants – Setback Requirement MC/PG 106–21 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0501 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission – Board of Ethics – Financial Disclosure Statements – Late Fees MC/PG 102–21 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/06/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0516 Bicounty Agencies – Prince George’s County – Use and Occupancy Permits – Notice Requirements MC/PG 107-21 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0789 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission – Video and Audio Streaming and Archiving Meetings and Financial Assistance MC/PG 100–21 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/06/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/13/2021 12:14 AM
Click to return on the top page