Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Health And Government Operations Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0648 /CH0288
Title
Maryland Emergency Management Agency - Definitions and Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0649
Title
State Finance and Procurement – Procedures and Pricing and Selection Committee for Preferred Providers
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0650
Title
State Government - Emergency Management - Governor Declarations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0661
Title
State Government - Notaries Public - Notary Public Fund and Remote Notarial Acts
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0662 /CH0289
Title
Department of General Services - Energy Consumption Goals and Energy Performance Contracts
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0663 /CH0290
Title
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Out-of-State Pharmacists and Discipline for Noncompliance
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0664
Title
Pharmacists - Required Notification and Authorized Substitution - Lower-Costing Drugs, Medical Devices, and Biological Products
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0692
Title
Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1183
Title
State Government - Information Technology - Cybersecurity
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1572
Title
Intermediate Care Facilities - Substance-Related Disorder Treatment Services - Review and Certificate of Need
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1573
Title
State Government - Information Technology - Review of Projects and Proposals
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0303 /CH0158 (SB0182/CH0159)
Title
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0391 (SB0306/CH0548)
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0560 /CH0612 (SB0395/CH0613)
Title
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0648 /CH0288 Maryland Emergency Management Agency - Definitions and Authority By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 288
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2020 - 11:00 AM
HB0649 State Finance and Procurement – Procedures and Pricing and Selection Committee for Preferred Providers By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0650 State Government - Emergency Management - Governor Declarations By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2020 - 11:00 AM
HB0661 State Government - Notaries Public - Notary Public Fund and Remote Notarial Acts By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0662 /CH0289 Department of General Services - Energy Consumption Goals and Energy Performance Contracts By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 289
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2020 - 11:00 AM
HB0663 /CH0290 Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Out-of-State Pharmacists and Discipline for Noncompliance By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 290
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0664 Pharmacists - Required Notification and Authorized Substitution - Lower-Costing Drugs, Medical Devices, and Biological Products By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0692 Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1183 State Government - Information Technology - Cybersecurity By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1572 Intermediate Care Facilities - Substance-Related Disorder Treatment Services - Review and Certificate of Need By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1573 State Government - Information Technology - Review of Projects and Proposals By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB0303 /CH0158 (SB0182/CH0159) State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 158
Health and Government Operations
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0391 (SB0306/CH0548) State Board of Dental Examiners - Sunset Extension By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0560 /CH0612 (SB0395/CH0613) State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 612
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:16 PM