Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Frederick County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0145 /CH0078 (SB0215/CH0079)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Repeal of Quota for Class B Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0146 /CH0080 (SB0214/CH0081)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Weinberg Center License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0309 (SB0317)
Title
Frederick County - Career Exploration and Development Activities - Coffee
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0322 /CH0167 (SB0612)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cinema/Theater License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0353 /CH0178 (SB0264/CH0179)
Title
Frederick County - Elderly or Disabled Renters - Grants
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0410 (SB0316)
Title
Frederick County Board of Education - Vacancies
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0418 (SB0559)
Title
Frederick County - Solar Energy - Municipal Electric Utilities
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0580 /CH0262 (SB0450/CH0263)
Title
Maryland Department of Health – Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories in Frederick County
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0909 /CH0363 (SB0744/CH0364)
Title
Frederick County - Board of Education - Compensation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1062 /CH0416
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Municipal Golf Course License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1385
Title
Town of Mount Airy (Carroll County and Frederick County) - Urban Renewal Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0145 /CH0078 (SB0215/CH0079) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Repeal of Quota for Class B Licenses By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 78
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0146 /CH0080 (SB0214/CH0081) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Weinberg Center License By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 80
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0309 (SB0317) Frederick County - Career Exploration and Development Activities - Coffee By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0322 /CH0167 (SB0612) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cinema/Theater License By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 167
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0353 /CH0178 (SB0264/CH0179) Frederick County - Elderly or Disabled Renters - Grants By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 178
Ways and Means
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0410 (SB0316) Frederick County Board of Education - Vacancies By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/07/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0418 (SB0559) Frederick County - Solar Energy - Municipal Electric Utilities By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0580 /CH0262 (SB0450/CH0263) Maryland Department of Health – Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories in Frederick County By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 262
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0909 /CH0363 (SB0744/CH0364) Frederick County - Board of Education - Compensation By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 363
Ways and Means
2/21/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1062 /CH0416 Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Municipal Golf Course License By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 416
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1385 Town of Mount Airy (Carroll County and Frederick County) - Urban Renewal Authority By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/8/2020 3:47 PM