Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Economic Matters Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0144 /CH0077
Title
Insurance - Uninsured or Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage - Property Damage
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0851 (SB0026)
Title
Partnership for Workforce Quality Program - Alterations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0853
Title
Local Government - Clean Energy Loan Programs - Grid Resilience Projects
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0855
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Money Transmissions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0891
Title
Foreign Corporations - Resident Agents - State Department of Assessments and Taxation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0144 /CH0077 Insurance - Uninsured or Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage - Property Damage By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 77
Economic Matters
1/30/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/16/2020 - 10:00 AM
HB0851 (SB0026) Partnership for Workforce Quality Program - Alterations By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Finance
Economic Matters
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0853 Local Government - Clean Energy Loan Programs - Grid Resilience Projects By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Economic Matters
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0855 Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Money Transmissions By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed
Economic Matters
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0891 Foreign Corporations - Resident Agents - State Department of Assessments and Taxation By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Economic Matters
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/1/2020 2:17 PM