Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Allegany County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0532 (SB0452)
Title
Gaming - Video Lottery Facilities - Payout Percentages, Distribution of Proceeds, and Building Restrictions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0637 (SB0453)
Title
Allegany County and Garrett County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0880 (SB0679)
Title
Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Annual Fees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0883 (SB0677)
Title
Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1059 (SB0731)
Title
Allegany and Garrett Counties - Alcoholic Beverages - Gift Basket Permits
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0532 (SB0452) Gaming - Video Lottery Facilities - Payout Percentages, Distribution of Proceeds, and Building Restrictions By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Ways and Means
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0637 (SB0453) Allegany County and Garrett County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0880 (SB0679) Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Annual Fees By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0883 (SB0677) Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D Beer, Wine, and Liquor License By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1059 (SB0731) Allegany and Garrett Counties - Alcoholic Beverages - Gift Basket Permits By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 6:41 PM
Click to return on the top page