Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Department Of Information Technology

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1183
Title
State Government - Information Technology - Cybersecurity
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1573
Title
State Government - Information Technology - Review of Projects and Proposals
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0082 /CH0517
Title
Management of eMaryland Marketplace
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0083 /CH0518
Title
State Government - Delivery of Notices and Communications by Electronic Means - Authorized
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1183 State Government - Information Technology - Cybersecurity By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1573 State Government - Information Technology - Review of Projects and Proposals By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0082 /CH0517 Management of eMaryland Marketplace By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 517
Finance
1/09/2020 - 1:45 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2020 - 11:00 AM
SB0083 /CH0518 State Government - Delivery of Notices and Communications by Electronic Means - Authorized By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 518
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2020 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2020 - 11:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/8/2020 3:37 PM