Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Health, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0262 /CH0141
Title
Criminal Procedure - Examination of Defendant by Maryland Department of Health - Access to Judicial Records
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0663 /CH0290
Title
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Out-of-State Pharmacists and Discipline for Noncompliance
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0664
Title
Pharmacists - Required Notification and Authorized Substitution - Lower-Costing Drugs, Medical Devices, and Biological Products
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0674 /CH0298
Title
Controlled Dangerous Substances - Schedules
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0692
Title
Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0042 /CH0505
Title
Health Services Cost Review Commission - Duties and Reports - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0102 /CH0526
Title
Vital Records - Birth Certificates - Change of Name of Child
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0106
Title
Health Care Facilities - Certificate of Need - Exception for State-Owned Facilities
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0262 /CH0141 Criminal Procedure - Examination of Defendant by Maryland Department of Health - Access to Judicial Records By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 141
Judiciary
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0663 /CH0290 Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Out-of-State Pharmacists and Discipline for Noncompliance By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 290
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0664 Pharmacists - Required Notification and Authorized Substitution - Lower-Costing Drugs, Medical Devices, and Biological Products By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0674 /CH0298 Controlled Dangerous Substances - Schedules By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 298
Judiciary
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0692 Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0042 /CH0505 Health Services Cost Review Commission - Duties and Reports - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 505
Finance
1/15/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2020 - 11:00 AM
SB0102 /CH0526 Vital Records - Birth Certificates - Change of Name of Child By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 526
Finance
1/23/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2020 - 11:00 AM
SB0106 Health Care Facilities - Certificate of Need - Exception for State-Owned Facilities By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
1/14/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/8/2020 3:37 PM