Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Federal Energy Regulatory Commission Order
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Urging the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission to reverse its Order in the PJM Reliability Pricing Model Capacity dockets.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Federal Energy Regulatory Commission Order
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Federal Energy Regulatory Commission Order
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/3/2020 10:31 AM