Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Congressional Action - Surprise Billing - Air Ambulance
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Augustine, Feldman, Hayes, Hershey, Lam, and Washington
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Urging the U.S. Congress to pass legislation that prohibits the balance billing of consumers by certain air ambulances.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Congressional Action - Surprise Billing - Air Ambulance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {497775/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Congressional Action - Surprise Billing - Air Ambulance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
42A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Congressional Action - Surprise Billing - Air Ambulance
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Favorable with Amendments {497775/1 Adopted 39
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39
Text - Third - Congressional Action - Surprise Billing - Air Ambulance
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41
House 3/06/2020 3/05/2020 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 42A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:34 PM