Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish
Sponsored by
Senators Guzzone, Bailey, Carozza, Eckardt, Elfreth, Ellis, Gallion, Hershey, Hester, Pinsky, and Washington
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Opposing certain inspection rules promulgated by the U.S. Department of Agriculture that have drastically impeded the harvest and sale of blue catfish and thus rendered the State unable to adequately use the commercial harvest as a form of control over the invasive blue catfish species; urging the U.S. Congress to amend 21 U.S.C. § 601(w) to exempt the wild catch of domestic catfish from certain inspection requirements; and requiring a copy of the Resolution to be forwarded to certain elected officials.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HJ0003
Bill File Type: Regular
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
46
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Favorable Adopted 43
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Second Reading Passed 43
Text - Third - Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 45
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 46
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:34 PM