Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government – State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency – Authority of Governor and Unemployment Insurance Benefits (COVID–19 Public Health Emergency Protection Act of 2020)
Sponsored by
The President and Senator Lam
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 13
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Governor to take certain actions as a result of the issuance by the Governor on March 5, 2020, of the proclamation declaring a state of emergency for the duration of a certain emergency; providing that a certain alternative workweek may allow an employee to work certain hours or shifts; requiring that an employee authorized to work an alternative workweek is considered a full-time employee; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1663
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Lam) Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator Lam) Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {937874/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Senator Kelley) Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {117171/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {153922/1 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Senator Kelley) Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {863722/1 (Senator Kelley) Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
49BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {956688/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Cullison) Adopted (126-5)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (123-6)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
3/19/2020
Legislative Date
3/19/2020
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 13
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Lam) Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator Lam) Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Referred Finance 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - First - State Government - State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency - Authority of Governor (COVID-19 Public Health Emergency Protection Act of 2020)
Senate 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable with Amendments {937874/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Senator Kelley) Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Floor Committee Amendment {117171/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Floor Amendment {153922/1 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Senator Kelley) Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Floor Amendment {863722/1 (Senator Kelley) Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Government – State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency – Authority of Governor and Unemployment Insurance Benefits (COVID–19 Public Health Emergency Protection Act of 2020)
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 49BClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments {956688/1 Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Cullison) Adopted (126-5) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (123-6) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Senate Concurs House Amendments 53AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 53AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Government – State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency – Authority of Governor and Unemployment Insurance Benefits (COVID–19 Public Health Emergency Protection Act of 2020)
Post Passage 3/19/2020 3/19/2020 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 13
Text - Chapter - State Government – State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency – Authority of Governor and Unemployment Insurance Benefits (COVID–19 Public Health Emergency Protection Act of 2020)
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:33 PM
Click to return on the top page