Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Mold Inspections - Standards, Reporting, and Penalties
Sponsored by
Senator Patterson
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment, in consultation with the Maryland Department of Health, the State Department of Education, the Department of Housing and Community Development, and the Department of General Services, to adopt certain regulations on or before June 1, 2022, establishing uniform standards for mold assessment and remediation; requiring the Department of the Environment to submit a certain annual indoor air quality report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1 beginning in 2023; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1540
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - Mold Inspections - Standards, Reporting, and Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Environment - Mold Inspections - Standards, Reporting, and Penalties
Senate 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9.5-401 )
(   6-1601, 6-1602 )
(   8-211.2 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:33 PM