Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Healthy Maryland Program as a public corporation and a unit of State government; stating that the General Assembly finds that millions of dollars have been diverted or wasted as part of a multipayer health care system; stating that it is the intent of the General Assembly that Healthy Maryland be established to provide comprehensive universal health coverage for every Maryland resident and be funded by certain revenue; establishing the Healthy Maryland Board and the Healthy Maryland Public Advisory Committee; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1648
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0871 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Senate 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   25-101 through 25-1204 )
(   31-101, 31-104, 31-105 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:33 PM