Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Health Care Facilities - Employees - Alternative Workweeks
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Secretary of Health to authorize an employee of a State facility to work according to an "alternative workweek", which means a work schedule under which a certain employee works atypical shifts and may work less than 40 hours in a week; requiring that a certain employee be considered a full-time employee of the State; providing that certain provisions of law governing the payment for overtime work apply to employees of a State facility who are authorized to work according to a certain alternative workweek; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1646
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Health Care Facilities - Employees - Alternative Workweeks
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - State Health Care Facilities - Employees - Alternative Workweeks
Senate 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:33 PM